Global Patent Index - EP 1053122 A1

EP 1053122 A1 2000-11-22 - PASSENGER SEAT

Title (en)

PASSENGER SEAT

Title (de)

FAHRGASTSITZ

Title (fr)

SIEGE PASSAGER

Publication

EP 1053122 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907488 A

Priority

  • DE 19804174 A
  • EP 9900697 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19804174A1] The invention relates to a vehicle seat, especially a passenger seat in a motor coach, with an armrest (4) which is mounted such that it can swivel between a useful position and a stowed position. The armrest has an armrest limb (5) and a supporting limb (6) connected thereto, whereby the supporting limb (6) is at least mounted on the side of the seat (1). The supporting limb is mounted with the free end (7) thereof on a swivel axle (8) such that it can swivel. The invention provides an improved seat which retains the advantages of the seat while allowing access to the aisle when the armrest is in a useful position and, at the same time, whose armrest occupies less space in the lateral area next to the seat. To this end, the supporting limb is comprised of a flat profile on at least the free end thereof. The longitudinal sides of the profile essentially extend in the direction of the armrest limb and extend in a manner which is parallel to the swivel axis, whereby, in a stowed position, the armrest limb is at least arranged essentially inside a seat contour located underneath a seat surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60N 2/24; B60N 2/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/54 (2006.01); B60N 2/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/543 (2013.01); B60N 2/4606 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939935A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19804174 A1 19990812; DE 19804174 B4 20040408; EP 1053122 A1 20001122; TR 200002286 T2 20010723; WO 9939935 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020421

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GLINKA, OLIVER

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GLINKA, OLIVER

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT PT