Global patent index - EP 1053138 A1

EP 1053138 A1 2000-11-22 - AUTOMATED ACCOUNTING SYSTEM THAT VALUES, CONTROLS, RECORDS AND BILLS THE USES OF EQUIPMENT/VEHICLES FOR SOCIETY

Title (en)

AUTOMATED ACCOUNTING SYSTEM THAT VALUES, CONTROLS, RECORDS AND BILLS THE USES OF EQUIPMENT/VEHICLES FOR SOCIETY

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHES BUCHHALTUNGSSYSTEM ZUM BEWERTEN, STEUERN, AUFZEICHNEN UND VERRECHNEN DER NUTZUNG VON AUSRÜSTUNGEN ODER FAHRZEUGEN FÜR EINEN BETRIEB

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMPTABILITE AUTOMATISE QUI EVALUE, VERIFIE, ENREGISTRE ET FACTURE LES UTILISATIONS DE MATERIEL ET/OU DE VEHICULES POUR UNE SOCIETE

Publication

EP 1053138 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99903125 A

Priority

  • US 9900919 W
  • US 7139298 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936297A1] This invention addresses environmental social and commercial uses and includes a monitoring system (310) which is a network of on, in, out and off-board devices working together with people through software (311) and interfaces (306a) to provide services and make accountable humanity's machines and their actions through safe secure communications. Control devices are used to provide accountability for their socio-economic and environmental impact. Along with these systems networked together, additional devices (315, 316, and 317) and variations needed to complete these operations nationally and world wide are also provided. Unique ways interface a network of separate devices or IC circuits to create an interactive secure control system or center that can be remotely controlled. A control device for society to fairly and accurately monitor and control the impact of equipment use on the world environment, and a nation's infrastructure while developing commercial companies to fulfill these needs and services for the equipment and the people who own and operate them for today and into the future are also provided. A set of secure devices and systems are also included to analyze society and machine interaction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 25/00; G06F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 25/33 (2013.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06Q 99/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 99/00 (2013.01); B60R 25/33 (2013.01); B60R 2325/205 (2013.01); B60W 2550/402 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936297 A1 19990722; WO 9936297 A9 19991111; WO 9936297 B1 19991007; AU 2322199 A 19990802; CA 2318139 A1 19990722; EP 1053138 A1 20001122; EP 1053138 A4 20030716

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-17 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1031109

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061014

2003-07-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 60R 25/00 A

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 13/00 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 17/60 B

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE