Global Patent Index - EP 1053159 A1

EP 1053159 A1 2000-11-22 - FLEXIBLE PLATFORM DOOR SYSTEM

Title (en)

FLEXIBLE PLATFORM DOOR SYSTEM

Title (de)

FLEXIBLES BAHNSTEIGTÜRENSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PORTES SOUPLE POUR QUAI DE GARE

Publication

EP 1053159 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932409 A

Priority

  • DE 19803991 A
  • EP 9900672 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19803991A1] The invention relates to a platform door system (1) comprising a barrier (10) having barrier elements (12) which can be aligned along a track (3) and/or a platform (4). The barrier elements (12) can be displaced in relation to each other in such a way that they overlap at least partly so that freely definable, predetermined openings (5) can be created along the track (3) and/or platform (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 1/02 (2006.01); B61L 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938747A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19803991 A1 19990805; DE 19803991 C2 20020131; AU 3252599 A 19990816; CA 2319802 A1 19990805; CA 2319802 C 20080318; CN 1099975 C 20030129; CN 1289295 A 20010328; EP 1053159 A1 20001122; EP 1053159 B1 20020515; ES 2173751 T3 20021016; HK 1033566 A1 20021011; JP 2002501856 A 20020122; US 6360668 B1 20020326; WO 9938747 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901441

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2016-03-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160330

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-08-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RAUCH, JUERGEN

- Free text: RAUCH, JUERGEN#HELENE-WEBER-ALLEE 15#80637 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- RAUCH, JUERGEN#HELENE-WEBER-ALLEE 15#80637 MUENCHEN (DE)

2003-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2173751 T3

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-07-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901441 20020620

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE ESTABLI

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010905

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI