Global Patent Index - EP 1053196 A1

EP 1053196 A1 2000-11-22 - YARN SUPPLY SYSTEM

Title (en)

YARN SUPPLY SYSTEM

Title (de)

FADENLIEFERSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DISTRIBUTEUR DE FILS

Publication

EP 1053196 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907428 A

Priority

  • EP 9900507 W
  • SE 9800226 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937566A1] The invention relates to a yarn supply system (L), especially for a shuttle loom, having at least one yarn supply device (F) comprising a storage element (7) and a wind-up element (6) as well as a rotating drive (5) for generating a relative rotational movement between the storage element and wind-up element so as to form a yarn supply (S) on the storage element which supply consists of coils. When the yarn (Y) is to be used it can be unwound from the storage element overend. The system also comprises yarn control and monitoring devices (B, 19, 20) arranged on the yarn supply device and a nozzle device (D) which is integrated into the yarn supply device, has at least one air outlet (22, 24, 24") for a directed air jet (J) and is connected to a compressed air supply (B). The air outlet (22, 24, 24") is directed towards the unwinding area (A) of the yarn supply device (F) and an interrupter device (CD) is provided for upstream of the air outlet for intermittently activating individual air jet blasts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/361 (2013.01); D03D 47/362 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937566A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937566 A1 19990729; CN 1092125 C 20021009; CN 1289305 A 20010328; DE 59902337 D1 20020919; EP 1053196 A1 20001122; EP 1053196 B1 20020814; SE 9800226 D0 19980126

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090126

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IROPA A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-10-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030515

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902337

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT NL

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010927

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT NL