Global Patent Index - EP 1053197 A1

EP 1053197 A1 2000-11-22 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REDUCING SLIP AFTER CHANGING A FLYING REEL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REDUCING SLIP AFTER CHANGING A FLYING REEL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KÜRZEN DER FAHNE IM ANSCHLUSS AN EINEN FLIEGENDEN ROLLENWECHSEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REDUIRE LE DRAPEAU SUITE A UN CHANGEMENT DE ROULEAU EN DEFILEMENT

Publication

EP 1053197 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907406 A

Priority

  • DE 19804415 A
  • EP 9900436 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19804415C1] When changing a flying reel, a slip occurs at the junction point that may induce problems in a downstream-mounted processing station. According to the present invention, the paper web (1) is guided by a deflection roller (3) so that the slip (2) is located on the outer face and extends radially under the action of the centrifugal force while being optionally supported by air ejected from blowing nozzles (8, 9). The slip is then cut with a blade (7) located in the vicinity of the outer surface of the deflection roller (3) so that only an insignificant length of a few millimetres remains.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/10; B65H 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/10 (2006.01); B65H 19/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/107 (2013.01); B65H 2301/46152 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940004A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19804415 C1 19990826; CA 2319410 A1 19990812; EP 1053197 A1 20001122; EP 1053197 B1 20020102; ES 2169945 T3 20020716; JP 2002502787 A 20020129; JP 3418176 B2 20030616; US 6547179 B1 20030415; WO 9940004 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040124

2005-01-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050123

2004-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-09-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040123

2004-08-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-08-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040131

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040124

2004-01-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040124

2004-01-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040123

2003-02-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030131

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030128

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030124

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169945 T3

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020404

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900714 20020228

2002-02-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010517

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE