Global Patent Index - EP 1053203 A1

EP 1053203 A1 2000-11-22 - BUILDER'S HOIST

Title (en)

BUILDER'S HOIST

Title (de)

BAUAUFZUG

Title (fr)

MONTE-CHARGE

Publication

EP 1053203 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908829 A

Priority

  • DE 29802092 U
  • EP 9900536 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940016A1] The invention relates to a builder's hoist, comprising a hoist platform, a hoist mast and a hoist cab which travels up and down said hoist mast. The aim of the invention is to provide a hoist of this type which is suitable for transporting people and loads as simply as possible. To this end, the hoist cab (13) consists of at least one cab base module (1) which has a carrying platform (2) and at least one side part, preferably a side wall (3), said side part being fixed to the carrying platform (2). In addition to the at least one fixed side wall (3), replaceable side wall sections (4, 5; 6, 7) and a roof covering (8) which is detachably arranged on the top face of the at least one fixed side wall (3) are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 9/187; B66B 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/187 (2006.01); B66B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0226 (2013.01); B66B 9/187 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940016A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29802092 U1 19981008; AT 225309 T 20021015; AU 2830499 A 19990823; EP 1053203 A1 20001122; EP 1053203 B1 20021002; JP 2002502790 A 20020129; WO 9940016 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902922

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BOECKER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BOECKER MASCHINENWERKE GMBH, 59368 WERNE, DE

- Document: DE 59902922

- Effective date: 20121107

2012-12-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59902922

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE MEINKE, DABRINGHAUS, DE

- Effective date: 20121107

2012-11-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59902922

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE MEINKE, DABRINGHAUS, DE

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-07-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021002

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-01-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2003-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2003-01-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902922 20021107

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225309 T 20021015

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011219

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE