Global Patent Index - EP 1053204 A2

EP 1053204 A2 2000-11-22 - OVERLOAD PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR A BUILDER'S HOIST

Title (en)

OVERLOAD PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR A BUILDER'S HOIST

Title (de)

ÜBERLASTSICHERUNG FÜR BAUAUFZUG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SECURITE DE SURCHARGE DESTINE A UN MONTE-CHARGE

Publication

EP 1053204 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99910159 A

Priority

  • DE 29802090 U
  • EP 9900534 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940014A2] The invention relates to a builder's hoist, comprising a hoist mast, a hoist cab, and at least one electric drive motor for moving the hoist cab up and down the hoist mast. An overload protection system is also provided. The aim of the invention is to create an overload protection system as simply as possible for a builder's hoist which is provided with at least two drive motors. To this end, at least two drive motors (5, 6) are provided and the overload protection system has a device for adding up the forces present in the supports of the drive motors (5, 6). Said device is connected to a limit switch (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 9/187

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/14 (2006.01); B66B 9/187 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/14 (2013.01); B66B 9/187 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940014A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29802090 U1 19980827; AT 218502 T 20020615; AU 2922899 A 19990823; EP 1053204 A2 20001122; EP 1053204 B1 20020605; JP 2002502789 A 20020129; WO 9940014 A2 19990812; WO 9940014 A3 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BOECKER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BOECKER MASCHINENWERKE GMBH, 59368 WERNE, DE

- Document: DE 59901619

- Effective date: 20121107

2012-12-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59901619

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE MEINKE, DABRINGHAUS, DE

- Effective date: 20121107

2012-11-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59901619

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE MEINKE, DABRINGHAUS, DE

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-01-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-01-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-12-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-12-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-09-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-09-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-09-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901619 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 218502 T 20020615

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010807

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE