Global Patent Index - EP 1053211 A1

EP 1053211 A1 2000-11-22 - METHOD FOR FINAL COOLING ANHYDROUS ALUMINUM OXIDE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FINAL COOLING ANHYDROUS ALUMINUM OXIDE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SCHLUSSKÜHLUNG VON WASSERFREIEM ALUMINIUMOXID

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LE REFROIDISSEMENT FINAL D'OXYDE D'ALUMINIUM ANHYDRE

Publication

EP 1053211 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932495 A

Priority

  • DE 19805897 A
  • EP 9900670 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19805897C1] The invention relates to a method for the final cooling of aluminum oxide produced on the basis of aluminum hydroxide in a circulating fluidized bed, wherein final cooling is carried out in a fluidized bed reactor consisting of two successively connected cooling stages (5a, 5b) that are subdivided into several cooling chambers (A, B, C, D, E, F). In the first cooling stage (5a), the fluidizing gas to be supplied to the fluidized bed reactor, which is introduced as a primary gas in the first cooling stage (5b), is heated and the anhydrous aluminum oxide is cooled with a heat-exchanging medium that is fed in countercurrent. According to the inventive method, the dispersion containing anhydrous aluminum oxide evacuated from the first cooling stage (5a) is passed through a cyclone (2) and the anhydrous aluminum oxide evacuated in the lower part of the cyclone (20) is directly introduced in the second cooling stage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C01F 7/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01F 7/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C01F 7/445 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941199A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB GR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805897 C1 19981203; AU 3252499 A 19990830; AU 747716 B2 20020523; BR 9907869 A 20001024; CN 1290234 A 20010404; EP 1053211 A1 20001122; WO 9941199 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040810

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHMIDT, HANS-WERNER, DR. ING.

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JANSSEN, KLAUS, DR. ING

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RAHN, MARTIN

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020219

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB GR LI