Global Patent Index - EP 1053230 A1

EP 1053230 A1 2000-11-22 - TRIAZINE ANTIVIRAL COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

TRIAZINE ANTIVIRAL COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

ANTIVIRALE TRIAZINVERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES DE TRIAZINE ANTIVIRAUX

Publication

EP 1053230 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902309 A

Priority

  • US 9900945 W
  • US 643098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936410A1] The present invention provides pharmaceutical formulations comprising 1,3,5-triazine derivatives. The compounds and formulations of the present invention exhibit a range of activities, including antiviral and antibiotic activities, and the formulations may be used, alone or in combination, as a method of treating a patient in need of antiviral and/or antibiotic therapy. The triazine derivatives of the present invention bind to and inhibit functional nucleic acids, and hence, have broad applicability in the treatment of conditions associated with DNA and RNA viruses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 251/66; A61K 31/53; C07D 251/70; C07D 403/12; C07D 405/12; C07D 409/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61K 31/53 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); C07D 251/66 (2006.01); C07D 251/70 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01); C07D 487/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 403/12 (2013.01); C07D 251/66 (2013.01); C07D 251/70 (2013.01); C07D 405/12 (2013.01); C07D 409/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936410A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936410 A1 19990722; WO 9936410 A9 19990930; CA 2318362 A1 19990722; EP 1053230 A1 20001122; JP 2002509140 A 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020528

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANADYS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ARENAS, JAIME, E.

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CLOAD, SHARON, T.

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FLEMING, ELIZABETH, S.

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: XIANG, YI, BIN

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE