Global Patent Index - EP 1053242 A1

EP 1053242 A1 2000-11-22 - DICARBAMOYL-FUNCTIONALIZED METAL COMPLEXES

Title (en)

DICARBAMOYL-FUNCTIONALIZED METAL COMPLEXES

Title (de)

DICARBAMOYLFUNKTIONALISIERTE METALLKOMPLEXE

Title (fr)

COMPLEXES METALLIQUES A FONCTION DICARBAMOYLE

Publication

EP 1053242 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906215 A

Priority

  • DE 19804969 A
  • EP 9900651 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19804969A1] The invention relates to novel dicarbamoyl-substituted metal complexes and to their use in the polymerisation of olefins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 7/00; C07C 237/24; C07F 17/00; C08F 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 233/58 (2006.01); C07F 7/00 (2006.01); C07F 7/28 (2006.01); C07F 17/00 (2006.01); C08F 4/06 (2006.01); C08F 4/42 (2006.01); C08F 4/46 (2006.01); C08F 4/64 (2006.01); C08F 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 17/00 (2013.01); C07C 233/58 (2013.01); C07F 7/006 (2013.01); C08F 10/00 (2013.01); C07C 2101/10 (2013.01); C07C 2101/14 (2013.01); C07C 2103/74 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/64

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940095A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19804969 A1 19990812; EP 1053242 A1 20001122; JP 2002502855 A 20020129; WO 9940095 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011109

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000715

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL