Global Patent Index - EP 1053292 A1

EP 1053292 A1 2000-11-22 - FUEL GAS MIXTURE, IN PARTICULAR FOR CUTTING TORCH

Title (en)

FUEL GAS MIXTURE, IN PARTICULAR FOR CUTTING TORCH

Title (de)

BRENNBARE GASMISCHUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR SCHNEIDSAUERSTOFFBRENNER

Title (fr)

MELANGE GAZEUX COMBUSTIBLE, NOTAMMENT POUR CHALUMEAU D'OXYCOUPAGE

Publication

EP 1053292 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99901642 A

Priority

  • FR 9900165 W
  • FR 9801674 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774693A1] The invention concerns a fuel mixture containing acetylene, propane and propylene, such that the ratio Qp/Qa of the proportion (Qp) of propane and propylene to the proportion (Qa) of acetylene is such that: 1.1</=Qp/Qa</=4. Preferably, the propane/propylene proportion in the gas mixture ranges between 50:50 and 99:1. Advantageously, the gas mixture contains 15 % to 50 % by volume of acetylene, the remainder being propane and propylene. The invention is applicable to a fuel mixture for oxyacetylene cutting of metals, the fuel mixture being produced on the site of operation, in particular in a gas mixer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 3/02; B23K 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 3/02 (2006.01); C21D 1/52 (2006.01); F23D 14/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/42 (2013.01); C10L 3/02 (2013.01); C21D 1/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941340A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774693 A1 19990813; FR 2774693 B1 20030926; AU 2167899 A 19990830; EP 1053292 A1 20001122; WO 9941340 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030718

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE