Global Patent Index - EP 1053334 A1

EP 1053334 A1 2000-11-22 - PLANT ALKALINE AND NEUTRAL INVERTASES

Title (en)

PLANT ALKALINE AND NEUTRAL INVERTASES

Title (de)

PFLANZLICHE ALKALISCHE UND NEUTRALE INVERTASEN

Title (fr)

INVERTASES ALCALINES ET NEUTRES DE PLANTES

Publication

EP 1053334 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99907465 A

Priority

  • EP 9900623 W
  • GB 9802249 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940206A1] The present invention provides DNA comprising a sequence of nucleotides which can be translated into a protein with invertase activity, wherein highest activity is observed in the range of pH 6.0 to 7.5, as well as the encoded protein produced recombinantly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/55; C12N 9/26; C12N 15/11; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 9/26 (2006.01); C12N 15/55 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/2408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940206A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940206 A1 19990812; AR 014528 A1 20010228; AU 2721799 A 19990823; AU 742048 B2 20011213; CA 2319316 A1 19990812; CN 1289367 A 20010328; EP 1053334 A1 20001122; GB 9802249 D0 19980401; JP 2002505084 A 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034096

2004-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040227

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030616

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000805

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE