Global Patent Index - EP 1053349 A1

EP 1053349 A1 2000-11-22 - METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING THERAPEUTIC TARGETS

Title (en)

METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING THERAPEUTIC TARGETS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG THERAPEUTISCHER ZIELMOLEKÜLE

Title (fr)

PROCEDES D'IDENTIFICATION DE CIBLES THERAPEUTIQUES

Publication

EP 1053349 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99903346 A

Priority

  • US 9901463 W
  • US 10043698 P
  • US 7785398 P
  • US 10323098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937816A1] The present invention broadly provides a method for correlating the phenotype of a cell with its "functional genotype", that is, the constellation of expressed sequences in that cell. In addition, the invention provides a means for identifying therapeutically-relevant genes and gene products.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; C12N 5/06; C12N 5/08; C12N 15/10; G01N 33/48; G01N 33/50; G01N 33/574

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/1072 (2013.01); C12N 15/1079 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6809 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937816 A1 19990729; AU 2339199 A 19990809; AU 756357 B2 20030109; CA 2319148 A1 19990729; EP 1053349 A1 20001122; EP 1053349 A4 20041215; JP 2002500896 A 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060526

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-12-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 A

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/10 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/06 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/08 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/574 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/48 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/50 B

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE