Global Patent Index - EP 1053369 A1

EP 1053369 A1 2000-11-22 - SUPPORT POST SECURING SYSTEM

Title (en)

SUPPORT POST SECURING SYSTEM

Title (de)

STÜTZPFOSTENBEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FIXATION D'UN MONTANT DE SOUTIEN

Publication

EP 1053369 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97910162 A

Priority

AU 9700752 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924672A1] The Support Post Securing system allows for the removal and reinstallation of a support post fitted with tapered sleeves (12) installed in a ground tube (16) secured in concrete. The holding ability can be increased by applying downward pressure to post (17). The taper of sleeves (12) when fitted to post (17) installed in ground tube (16) seals ground tube (16) against water or foreign material entering ground tube (16). A cap (40) is fitted to ground tube (16), when the post is removed, to allow passage of traffic over the ground tube (16) and exclude foreign materials and water from the ground tube (16). Cap and post removal tools are also disclosed and are operated from a standing position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 9/013; E01F 9/011

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/011 (2006.01); E01F 9/013 (2006.01); E04H 12/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/2269 (2013.01); E01F 9/685 (2016.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924672 A1 19990520; AU 4767697 A 19990531; AU 731034 B2 20010322; CA 2309584 A1 19990520; EP 1053369 A1 20001122; EP 1053369 A4 20040707; JP 2002506148 A 20020226

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050224

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-07-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01F 9/013 A

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01F 9/011 B

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE