Global Patent Index - EP 1053380 A1

EP 1053380 A1 2000-11-22 - ELECTROMAGNETIC DRIVE MECHANISM FOR A GARAGE DOOR

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC DRIVE MECHANISM FOR A GARAGE DOOR

Title (de)

ELEKTROMECHANISCHER GARAGENTORANTRIEB

Title (fr)

MECANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT ELECTROMECANIQUE POUR PORTE DE GARAGE

Publication

EP 1053380 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99903639 A

Priority

  • DE 19808696 A
  • EP 9900249 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19808696A1] The present invention relates to an electromagnetic drive mechanism for a garage door, wherein said mechanism comprises the following members: a guiding rail (4, 5) mounted on the ceiling portion of the garage; a drive unit (6) which comprises a carriage and a drive motor and which is connected to the door (1) through an articulated rod (7); and a chain (35) which is parallel to the guiding rail and attached thereto and which is meshing with the motor. The power supply of the motor is ensured by the guiding rail (4) and by a power supply member which is parallel to said guiding rail, wherein said power supply member is formed by the rail (4) which is mounted on the ceiling and intended for receiving the door (1). The chain (35) is attached rigidly to one end of the rail mounted on the ceiling. At its other end (Fig. 6), the chain is clipped into said ceiling-mounted rail (4) and is provided with clamping members (41, 42, 44). The chain (35) is also part of the power supply member.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/67 (2013.01); E05F 15/684 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/604 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/708 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/46 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940286A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19808696 A1 19990812; AU 2421799 A 19990823; EP 1053380 A1 20001122; EP 1053380 B1 20020502; WO 9940286 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140118

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901343

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901343

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-08-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901343 20020606

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010629

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT