Global Patent Index - EP 1053383 A1

EP 1053383 A1 2000-11-22 - ROLL-UP GRATING AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A ROLL-UP GRATING

Title (en)

ROLL-UP GRATING AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A ROLL-UP GRATING

Title (de)

ROLLGITTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROLLGITTERS

Title (fr)

GRILLE DEROULANTE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE GRILLE-DEROULANTE

Publication

EP 1053383 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99914405 A

Priority

  • DE 9900299 W
  • DE 19804296 A
  • DE 19854273 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940289A1] A roll-up grating has rods (1) laterally guided transversely to the opening and closing direction of displacement of the roll-up grating, and connecting members (3, 16) which interconnect the rods (1) in an articulated manner. The connecting members (3, 16) are made of a single piece and have longitudinal openings for receiving the grating rods (1) with a closed, seamless outer surface. Also disclosed is a process for producing these roll-up gratings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/18 (2006.01); E06B 9/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/18 (2013.01); E06B 2009/1566 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940289A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940289 A1 19990812; AT 217383 T 20020515; DE 19903803 A1 19991014; EP 1053383 A1 20001122; EP 1053383 B1 20020508

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070204

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070204

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901395 20020613

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2002-05-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217383 T 20020515

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL