Global Patent Index - EP 1053399 A1

EP 1053399 A1 2000-11-22 - IGNITION DEVICE FOR A HIGH-FREQUENCY IGNITION

Title (en)

IGNITION DEVICE FOR A HIGH-FREQUENCY IGNITION

Title (de)

ZÜNDVORRICHTUNG FÜR HOCHFREQUENZ-ZÜNDUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ALLUMAGE POUR ALLUMAGE HAUTE FREQUENCE

Publication

EP 1053399 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99953706 A

Priority

  • DE 9902793 W
  • DE 19852652 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19852652A1] The invention relates to an ignition device with a high-frequency resonator. According to the invention, the resonator can be configured as a microstrip (12) on a printed board (100) (figure 3). Several resonators can be connected in a structure to the HF source via pin diodes. The resonator is electrically isolated at its cold end but is returned to earth via a capacitor in terms of high frequency. In this manner, ionic currents can be easily coupled thereto once an auxiliary voltage is applied.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 13/00 (2006.01); F02P 17/12 (2006.01); F02P 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 23/04 (2013.01); F02P 23/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0029746A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19852652 A1 20000518; BR 9907012 A 20001017; EP 1053399 A1 20001122; EP 1053399 B1 20040324; JP 2002530572 A 20020917; KR 20010034119 A 20010425; US 6357426 B1 20020319; WO 0029746 A1 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908953

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908953

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100903

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2005-09-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050920

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908953 P 20040429

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE