Global Patent Index - EP 1053401 A1

EP 1053401 A1 2000-11-22 - TUBULAR BRANCHING SYSTEM FOR DUAL-CYLINDER THICK-LIQUID PUMP

Title (en)

TUBULAR BRANCHING SYSTEM FOR DUAL-CYLINDER THICK-LIQUID PUMP

Title (de)

ROHRWEICHE FÜR ZWEIZYLINDER-DICKSTOFFPUMPE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE BIFURCATION TUBULAIRE POUR POMPE A LIQUIDES EPAIS A DEUX CYLINDRES

Publication

EP 1053401 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908801 A

Priority

  • DE 19804072 A
  • DE 19860185 A
  • EP 9900301 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6338615B1] The present invention relates to a pipe switch for a dual-cylinder thick-liquid pump, wherein said system comprises a pivoting pivot pipe (36) located in the front of a glasses-like wear plate (34) on the cylinder side as well as a wear ring (38) which is capable of limited axial displacement at the end of the pivot pipe (36) on the cylinder side. The ring can be pressed against the wear plate (34) by the hydrostatic pressure existing inside said pivot pipe. The wear ring 38 has a centering portion (46) guided on an axis-parallel centering surface (42) of the pivot pipe (36) as well as a sealing part (54) resting against the wear plate (34) through an abutment surface (52) on the cylinder side. The pivot pipe (36) and the sealing part (54) of the wear ring (38) have annular surfaces (56, 58) which face each other and which are axially spaced from one another by an annular gap (59) opened towards the inside of the pipe. An annular system (60) exhibiting at least a rubber elasticity is further provided, wherein said system axially covers the annular gap (59) and has its abutment surfaces (62, 64) resting in a prestressed manner against each of the annular surfaces (56, 58). In order to allow for an automatic anti-wear readjustment of the wear ring, the annular system (60) has an axial annular support (80) provided on its abutment surface (62) which faces the centering portion (46) of the wear ring (38), wherein said support (80) is made of a wear-resistant material which is more rigid than the rubber-elastic material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 15/02 (2006.01); F04B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 7/0096 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940320A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

US 6338615 B1 20020115; EP 1053401 A1 20001122; EP 1053401 B1 20030409; ES 2194445 T3 20031116; JP 2002502939 A 20020129; PT 1053401 E 20030829; WO 9940320 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090120

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090120

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-02-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-02-20 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-08-03 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070719

2007-07-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070719

2005-12-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20051230

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2194445 T3

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2000-12-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT