Global Patent Index - EP 1053407 A1

EP 1053407 A1 2000-11-22 - HIGH VALUE STATIC UNBALANCE-TYPE BALANCE SHAFTS

Title (en)

HIGH VALUE STATIC UNBALANCE-TYPE BALANCE SHAFTS

Title (de)

BALANCIERWELLEN VOM STATISCH HOCHGRADIG UNWUCHTEN TYP

Title (fr)

ARBRE D'EQUILIBRAGE STATIQUE SUPERIEUR, DU TYPE BALOURD

Publication

EP 1053407 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905822 A

Priority

  • US 9902601 W
  • US 7512798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0012906A1] A balance shaft (190) has a pair of journal members (192, 194), a main balance weight (196) positioned between the journal members (192, 194), and a second overhung balance weight (198) which extends on the other side of the second journal member (194). An I-beam shaped connector member (200) connects the main balance weight (196) to the first journal member (192), while providing bending stiffness in the region of the balance weight (196). A second I-beam shaped structural member (210) connects the second balance weight (198) to the second journal member (194) with high stiffness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16C 3/20; F02B 75/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16F 15/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16F 15/264 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0012906 A1 20000309; WO 0012906 A8 20010208; AU 2589799 A 20000321; EP 1053407 A1 20001122; EP 1053407 A4 20030910

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20090403

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060202

2006-02-01 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000830

2003-09-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16C 3/20 A

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02B 75/06 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16F 15/26 B

2001-03-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB