Global Patent Index - EP 1053440 A1

EP 1053440 A1 2000-11-22 - SNOW, ICE PARTICLE GENERATOR, OR NUCLEATION DEVICE, INTEGRATED IN A PRESSURISED WATER SPRAY HEAD FOR MAKING ARTIFICIAL SNOW

Title (en)

SNOW, ICE PARTICLE GENERATOR, OR NUCLEATION DEVICE, INTEGRATED IN A PRESSURISED WATER SPRAY HEAD FOR MAKING ARTIFICIAL SNOW

Title (de)

ERZEUGER FÜR EISPARTIKEL, SCHNEEPARTIKEL, ODER WASSER-LUFT DÜSE INTEGRIERT IM WASSERSPRÜHKOPF

Title (fr)

GENERATEUR DE PARTICULES DE GLACE, DE NEIGE, OU NUCLEATEUR, INTEGRE DANS UNE TETE DE PULVERISATION D'EAU

Publication

EP 1053440 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99902606 A

Priority

  • FR 9900258 W
  • FR 9801581 A
  • FR 9813477 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940381A1] The invention concerns a nucleation device associated with a spray head (1) and operating by either internal mixing or external mixing. The ratio air/water is not less than 200 and the pressurised water is supplied by the spray head nozzles (11), which, by the simple circulation of water, at the nucleation device (27), prevents freezing problems. Said nucleation device comprises means in the shape of a spray tip for high speed spraying (11) of compressed air and in the shape small diameter nozzles (13) for spraying pressurised water into the air stream. In one embodiment, the nucleation device is in the form of a mini snowmaker (52).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25C 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/14 (2006.01); B05B 7/08 (2006.01); F25C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/0807 (2013.01); B05B 1/14 (2013.01); F25C 3/04 (2013.01); F25C 2303/0481 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940381A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940381 A1 19990812; AT 257935 T 20040115; AU 2284199 A 19990823; CA 2319692 A1 19990812; DE 69914182 D1 20040219; EP 1053440 A1 20001122; EP 1053440 B1 20040114; JP 2002502951 A 20020129; NO 20003957 A 20001005; NO 20003957 D0 20000804; NO 312380 B1 20020429; US 6508412 B1 20030121

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161201

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151204

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-15 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20110331

2009-06-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SUFAG SPORT- UND FREIZEITANLAGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-12-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SUFAG SPORT- UND FREIZEITANLAGEN GMBHPATENTANWALT

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040425

2004-04-15 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-04-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914182 P 20040219

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020717

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI SE