Global patent index - EP 1053502 A1

EP 1053502 A1 2000-11-22 - ELECTROCHROMIC DISPLAY

Title (en)

ELECTROCHROMIC DISPLAY

Title (de)

ELEKTROCHROMES DISPLAY

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE ELECTROCHROMIQUE

Publication

EP 1053502 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906189 A

Priority

  • DE 19804314 A
  • EP 9900411 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19804314A1] The present invention relates to an electrochromic display system comprising a mirror which can be electrically dimmed, an optical filter whose transparency can be electrically modulated, or a display member. The display system comprises an electrochromic liquid located between two electrode surfaces, wherein at least one of said surfaces is transparent. The display system also includes a transparent electro-conductive layer. In order to provide an homogenous coloration of the electrochromic liquid, the transparent electrode surface comprises a striated pattern or a grid made of a metallic-conduction material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/155; G02F 1/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/15 (2006.01); G02F 1/155 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/155 (2013.01); G02F 1/1521 (2013.01); G02F 2001/1502 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940481A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19804314 A1 19990812; AU 2621199 A 19990823; EP 1053502 A1 20001122; JP 2002502990 A 20020129; US 6785036 B1 20040831; WO 9940481 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20061127

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER INNOVATION GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CHEMICALS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030328

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL