Global patent index - EP 1053526 A4

EP 1053526 A4 2000-12-20 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WEB TELEVISION FRANKING

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WEB TELEVISION FRANKING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DRUCKEN VON FRANKIERZEICHEN MITTELS EINES WEBFERNSEHSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'IMPRESSION D'ETIQUETTES POSTALES PAR TELEVISION EN RESEAU

Publication

EP 1053526 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99905498 A

Priority

  • US 9901781 W
  • US 7314498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939278A1] A system for printing postal indicia comprising a television set-top box (70) or web television interface connected via a communications means such as the Internet to a host system (65) containing a postal security device (10A) the indicia are printed using a label printer (81) on label stock (82).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/00; G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00024 (2013.01); G07B 17/00435 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00145 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5233657 A 19930803 - GUENTHER STEPHAN [DE]
  • [A] US 5561709 A 19961001 - REMILLARD ROGER [US]
  • [A] USPS, UNITED POSTAL SERVICE: "Information Based Indicia Program - Postal Security Device Specification", UNITED POSTAL SERVICE IBIP PROGRAM, 13 June 1996 (1996-06-13), XP002137734
  • See also references of WO 9939278A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939278 A1 19990805; CA 2319445 A1 19990805; EP 1053526 A1 20001122; EP 1053526 A4 20001220

INPADOC legal status

2007-02-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060822

2000-12-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001107

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06F 17/00 A, 7G 07B 17/00 B

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI