Global Patent Index - EP 1053552 A1

EP 1053552 A1 2000-11-22 - MAGNETIC FILM AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

MAGNETIC FILM AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

MAGNETFOLIE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

FILM MAGNETIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1053552 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907508 A

Priority

  • CH 31398 A
  • EP 9900779 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940592A1] The invention relates to hard magnetic films made of a polymer matrix and hard magnetic powder particles distributed therein. The films have a thickness of preferably 100 to 500 mu m and are flexible. They can be produced by using a casting method and are suited, for example, as hard magnetic components in miniature motors, polarized relays or sensors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/00; H01F 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/053 (2006.01); H01F 1/00 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01); H01F 41/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/16 (2013.01); H01F 1/0027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940592A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IE LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940592 A1 19990812; DE 59904223 D1 20030313; EP 1053552 A1 20001122; EP 1053552 B1 20030205; JP 2002503027 A 20020129; US 6464894 B1 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-11-15 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060205

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060206

2006-02-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060205

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-23 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040225

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-10-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904223 P 20030313

2003-03-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LONZA AG

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IE LI

2003-02-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A MAGNETIC FILM

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011002

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000819

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IE LI