Global Patent Index - EP 1053556 A1

EP 1053556 A1 2000-11-22 - ELECTROMAGNETIC CURRENT RELEASING DEVICE FOR ELECTRICAL CIRCUIT BREAKER

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC CURRENT RELEASING DEVICE FOR ELECTRICAL CIRCUIT BREAKER

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER STROMAUSLÖSER FÜR EINEN ELEKTRISCHEN SCHUTZSCHALTER

Title (fr)

DECLENCHEUR DE COURANT ELECTROMAGNETIQUE POUR UN DISJONCTEUR ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1053556 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99914393 A

Priority

  • DE 9900249 W
  • DE 29802348 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941760A1] The invention relates to an electromagnetic current releasing device (1), wherein a fixed magnetic core (6) which forms part of the magnetic system is built as a single piece with a terminal (8) used for connecting the magnetic spool (2) of the magnetic system, in the form of a stamped and bent piece. A cost effective current releasing device can thus be obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/24; H01H 71/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/28 (2006.01); H01H 33/38 (2006.01); H01H 71/08 (2006.01); H01H 71/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/08 (2013.01); H01H 71/2463 (2013.01); H01H 2071/249 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941760A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29802348 U1 19980423; CN 1174457 C 20041103; CN 1274469 A 20001122; EP 1053556 A1 20001122; EP 1053556 B1 20011212; JP 2002503869 A 20020205; WO 9941760 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050129

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900539

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-24

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT