Global Patent Index - EP 1053569 A1

EP 1053569 A1 2000-11-22 - PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR

Title (en)

PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR

Title (de)

PIEZOELEKTRISCHER AKTOR

Title (fr)

ACTIONNEUR PIEZOELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1053569 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99964392 A

Priority

  • DE 9903873 W
  • DE 19857247 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19857247C1] The invention relates to a piezoelectric actuator (1), especially for actuating control valves or injection valves of internal combustion engines in motor vehicles. Said actuator comprises a piezoelectric actuator body (1), especially in the form of a multilayered laminate consisting of tiered layers of piezoelectric material and metallic or electro-conductive layers which are arranged therebetween and which serve as electrodes. One of the front surfaces of the actuator body (1) is fixed to an actuator base (6) having good thermal conductibility or being metallic. The piezoelectric actuator is characterised in that at least one heat sink (5; 5.1, 5.2) with good thermal conductibility is connected to the lateral surfaces of the actuator body (1) and to the actuator base (6) in such a way that heat is conducted well.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 41/083; F02M 51/06; F02M 59/46; H01L 41/053

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); H01L 41/053 (2006.01); H01L 41/083 (2006.01); H02N 2/04 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/005 (2013.01); F02M 51/0603 (2013.01); H01L 41/053 (2013.01); F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); H01L 41/083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0036657A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857247 C1 20000127; EP 1053569 A1 20001122; JP 2002532658 A 20021002; US 6333587 B1 20011225; WO 0036657 A1 20000622

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050118

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE