Global patent index - EP 1053573 A1

EP 1053573 A1 2000-11-22 - ELECTRIC CONNECTION BASE PLATE IN PARTICULAR FOR EXPLOSIBLE ENVIRONMENT AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

ELECTRIC CONNECTION BASE PLATE IN PARTICULAR FOR EXPLOSIBLE ENVIRONMENT AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER SOCKELKONTAKT, INSBESONDERE FÜR EXPLOSIVE ATMOSPHÄRE, UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

SOCLE DE CONNEXION ELECTRIQUE, NOTAMMENT POUR ATMOSPHERE EXPLOSIBLE, ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1053573 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99956088 A

Priority

  • FR 9902844 W
  • FR 9815329 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2786932A1] The invention concerns an electric connection base plate (2), in particular for an explosible environment, provided with electrical contacts (4a, 4c) mounted in peripheral contact housings (5a, 5c) of an insulating unit (6) and designed to co-operate with the corresponding contact pins (3a, 3c) of a plug (1) while a safety disc (9) provided with at least as many peripheral orifices (10a, 10c) as the insulating unit is equipped with contact peripheral housings (5a, 5c), is mounted rotating on said insulating unit (6) through a central orifice (10b) with which it is equipped and whereof the inner surface co-operates with the lateral surface of a central protuberance (13) of the insulating unit (6) forming a rotating hub. The inventive base plate is characterised in that at least some of the surfaces in contact with the safety disc (9) and with the insulating unit (6) as well as the respective inner surfaces of at least the peripheral orifices (10a, 10c) of the safety disc (9) and outer surfaces of the plug corresponding pins (3a, 3c) form explosion-proof joint surfaces such that at least the insulating unit peripheral contact housings (5a, 5c) constitute at least an explosion-proof casing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/527; H01R 13/453

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/453 (2006.01); H01R 13/527 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4532 (2013.01); H01R 13/527 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0035054A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2786932 A1 20000609; FR 2786932 B1 20001229; AU 1277400 A 20000626; AU 753861 B2 20021031; DE 69922636 D1 20050120; DE 69922636 T2 20050525; EP 1053573 A1 20001122; EP 1053573 B1 20041215; WO 0035054 A1 20000615

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151109

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69922636

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-04-12 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

- Ref Legal Event Code: CL

- Name of requester: MARECHAL ELECTRIC, FR

- Effective date: 20130311

2013-03-15 [REG DE R088] EXCLUSIVE LICENCE REGISTERED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R088

- Ref Document Number: 69922636

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2008-04-11 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

- Ref Legal Event Code: CL

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69922636

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2005-01-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031009

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE