Global Patent Index - EP 1053692 A2

EP 1053692 A2 2000-11-22 - Brassiere reinforcing wire

Title (en)

Brassiere reinforcing wire

Title (de)

Bügelanordnung für Büstenhalter

Title (fr)

Armature pour soutien-gorge

Publication

EP 1053692 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109783 A

Priority

DE 29908627 U

Abstract (en)

The element (11) is a tube covering a wire (10) section. The wire (10) is guided in the tube, which contains a pressure spri The wire (10) acts against the spring as it shifts in the tube in the manner of a telescope. The adjustable element (11) is loca at least at one end of the wire (10), or at the apex of the wire below the bra cup.

Abstract (de)

Eine Bügelanordnung für Büstenhalter mit einem U-förmigen Versteifungsbügel (10), der in einer jeweils entlang des unteren Randes der Büstenkörbchen verlaufenden Tasche aufgenommen ist, ist zur Verringerung der Gesamtlänge des Versteifungsbügels an mindestens einer Stelle in dessen Verlauf mit einem längenveränderlichen Element (11) ausgestattet. Das längenveränderliche Element (11) kann eine einen Abschnitt, insbesondere einen Endabschnitt (10a) des Versteifungsbügels 810) übergreifende Hülse (12) sein, in welcher der Bügel gegen ein Druckfederelement (15) teleskopartig verschiebbar ist. Auf diese Weise wird dem Versteifungsbügel (10) eine Möglichkeit zur Verringerung seiner Gesamtlänge um den Betrag I gegeben, wodurch er der beim Waschen eintretenden Schrumpfung des Materials folgen kann, ohne seinen festen Sitz im Bügelkanal zu verlieren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/00 (2006.01); A41C 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/0028 (2013.01); A41C 3/126 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908627 U1 20000928; AT 270826 T 20040715; DE 50007040 D1 20040819; DK 1053692 T3 20041122; EP 1053692 A2 20001122; EP 1053692 A3 20010919; EP 1053692 B1 20040714; ES 2224959 T3 20050316; HK 1032338 A1 20050225

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007040

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DR. KELLER, SCHWERTFEGER, DE

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041214

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-05-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-03-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224959 T3

2005-02-25 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032338

2004-11-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040403282

2004-11-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-11-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-11-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007040 P 20040819

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2003-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI