Global Patent Index - EP 1053702 A1

EP 1053702 A1 2000-11-22 - An improved chair structure

Title (en)

An improved chair structure

Title (de)

Verbesserter Stuhl

Title (fr)

Fauteuil amélioré

Publication

EP 1053702 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00110179 A

Priority

IT PD990110 A

Abstract (en)

An improved chair structure is described and comprises a body (1) which defines a lower part (2) in turn including a seat (3), a lower backrest portion (5), and two arms (4a, 4b), and an upper part including an upper backrest portion (6). The upper backrest portion is articulated to the lower portion (2) in the region of the arms (4a, 4b) so as to be movable between an operative position in which it constitutes an extension of the lower backrest portion (5) and an inoperative, transportation position in which it is arranged substantially parallel to the seat (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/407 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053702 A1 20001122; IT 1306662 B1 20011002; IT PD990110 A1 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040427

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030113

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010322

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI