Global patent index - EP 1053706 A1

EP 1053706 A1 2000-11-22 - Mattress

Title (en)

Mattress

Title (de)

Matratze

Title (fr)

Matelas

Publication

EP 1053706 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00110155 A

Priority

DE 19923391 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19923391C1] The mattress has an upholstered (16) cover (13) forming a recliner surface, and has a textile, mesh cover (11) supported by a stretcher frame (5). The cover (13) covers only one (8a) of the two sides, while the opposite side (8b) has an outward pointing bulge matching the curvature (d) expected under pressure to the fabric stretched in the frame. The mattress has a sprung core (19); the bulge is formed of foam or latex inserts (20) of different thicknesses.

Abstract (de)

Bekannte Matratzen, sind mit einem den Kern vollständig umhüllenden Überzug mit einer Polsterung versehen , so daß sie zur Ober- und Unterseite hin gleich ausgebildet sind. Dies ist relativ aufwendig. Es wird vorgeschlagen, eine Matratze nur auf einer Seite mit dem gepolsterten Überzug zu versehen, um eine Liegefläche zu bilden, nach der anderen Seite hin dagegen lediglich mit einer Abdeckung zu versehen und zur Verwendung zusammen mit Liegebetten mit einer aus einer textilen Bespannung gebildeten Auflagefläche diese Unterseite in Abhängigkeit von der bei Belastung zu erwartenden Durchbiegung der Bespannung zu bombieren. Verwendung für Liegebetten mit einer Auflagefläche aus einer textilen Bespannung . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/04; A47C 27/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/14 (2006.01); A47C 27/04 (2006.01); A47C 27/05 (2006.01); A47C 27/15 (2006.01); A47C 27/20 (2006.01); A47C 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/022 (2013.01); A47C 27/056 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19923391 C1 20000831; EP 1053706 A1 20001122; IL 136221 D0 20010520; JP 2000342392 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI