Global Patent Index - EP 1053713 A2

EP 1053713 A2 2000-11-22 - Device for heating water, in particular in a dishwasher

Title (en)

Device for heating water, in particular in a dishwasher

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Heizen vom Wasser, insbesondere in einer Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour chauffer l'eau , en particulier dans un lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 1053713 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830126 A

Priority

IT MI990365 A

Abstract (en)

A device for heating water includes a metallic tube (T) on which there is wound a resistor (R), as well as a tapered body (N) mounted inside the tube (T) by means of a plurality of supports (S). In this way, thanks to the reduction of the free cross-section, an increase in the speed of the water flow is achieved without decreasing the heat exchange area while maintaining the same overall size. The subsequent higher rate of heat exchange allows to reduce the activation time and/or the power of the resistor, and thus ultimately to reduce the power consumption and/or limit the peak power absorbed by the machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4285 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053713 A2 20001122; EP 1053713 A3 20021218; IT 1309634 B1 20020130; IT MI990365 A1 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47L 15/42 A, 7F 24H 1/10 B

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI