Global Patent Index - EP 1053733 A2

EP 1053733 A2 2000-11-22 - Attachment for a shovel-type stretcher

Title (en)

Attachment for a shovel-type stretcher

Title (de)

Verschluss für eine Schaufeltrage

Title (fr)

Fixation pour un brancard de type pelle

Publication

EP 1053733 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810436 A

Priority

CH 95099 A

Abstract (en)

The snap lock unit for a scoop stretcher, for releasable locking of the carrier bars, comprises groove and tongue elements ( 7) which are produced as single-piece elements and have at least one contacting slide surface (61) with a wear resistant plastic coating.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schnappverschluss für eine Schaufeltrage zur lösbaren Verbindung ihrer Tragholme weist einen gabelförmigen Teil (6) und einen darin einschiebbaren zungenförmigen Teil (7) auf. Diese Teile (6,7) sind mittels eines federbelasteten Bolzens (5) lösbar miteinander verbindbar, wobei der gabelförmige Teil (6) Gleitflächen (61) aufweist, die an Gleitflächen (74) des zungenförmigen Teils (7) reiben. Mindestens eine der Gleitflächen (61, 74) ist durch eine Kunststoffbeschichtung gebildet weist eine zu der korrespondierenden Gleitfläche (61, 74) unterschiedliche Härte zur Reduktion der Gleitreibung auf. Durch die Beschichtung können Gewicht und Volumen der Verschlusselemente gering gehalten werden ohne Stablitätseinbussen zu erleiden. Zudem wird das Gleitverhalten verbessert und die Funktionsfähigkeit des Verschlusses wird über lange Zeit auch bei starker Belastung gewährleistet. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 1/003

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 1/003 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 1/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29610596 U1 19960919 - FICKLER HANS [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053733 A2 20001122; EP 1053733 A3 20020102

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-10-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI