Global Patent Index - EP 1053771 A2

EP 1053771 A2 2000-11-22 - In-line roller skate with two wheels

Title (en)

In-line roller skate with two wheels

Title (de)

Zweirädiger Einspurrollschuh

Title (fr)

Patins à deux roues en ligne

Publication

EP 1053771 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00401371 A

Priority

FR 9906386 A

Abstract (en)

The skate includes a chassis (1) to which the wheels (6a) are attached. The wheels are mounted via connection arms (7). A co spring assembly (13) is pivotally mounted between the connection arm and chassis at the wheel connection side of the arm. A furt damping unit (9) is pivotally attached between the distal end of the connection arm and the chassis.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention appartient au domaine des patins à roulettes en ligne. Patin en ligne comportant seulement deux roues, dans lequel on utilise une platine (1) de patin à deux essieux (7, 7') de deux roues chacun, à suspension arrière à ressort (13') et à suspension rigide ou à ressort à l'avant, avec assise oblique à l'avant. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 17/02; A63C 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/02 (2006.01); A63C 17/06 (2006.01); A63C 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/0046 (2013.01); A63C 17/062 (2013.01); A63C 17/064 (2013.01); A63C 17/1409 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053771 A2 20001122; EP 1053771 A3 20011121; FR 2793699 A1 20001124; FR 2793699 B1 20010713; JP 2001029533 A 20010206; TW 548116 B 20030821

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-09-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI