Global Patent Index - EP 1053832 A2

EP 1053832 A2 2000-11-22 - Cooperating die for crimping tool having a rotatable die wheel

Title (en)

Cooperating die for crimping tool having a rotatable die wheel

Title (de)

Zusammenwirkende Matritze für ein Krimp-Werkzeug mit drehbarem Matritzenrad

Title (fr)

Matrice cooperante pour outil avec une roue matrice rotative

Publication

EP 1053832 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00870104 A

Priority

  • US 31123099 A
  • US 31181499 A

Abstract (en)

The crimping tool comprises a frame having first and second jaws, and a first die connected to the frame at one of the jaws, the crimping tool further comprising a co-operating die (16) mounted to the frame opposite the first die, the co-operating die comprising a bottom mounting section (54), a top section (56) with at least one crimping surface (68). The co-operating die comprises at least one extending support surface (58a, 58b, 60a, 60b), extending from a side of the co-operating die, said surface resting against an edge of the frame. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 7/04; H01R 43/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053832 A2 20001122; EP 1053832 A3 20030528; BR 0002191 A 20010102; CA 2307946 A1 20001113; JP 2000357576 A 20001226; MX PA00004503 A 20020308; TW 449536 B 20010811

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031201

2004-03-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-02-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI