Global patent index - EP 1053840 A2

EP 1053840 A2 2000-11-22 - Process for bending lamellar wood

Title (en)

Process for bending lamellar wood

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Biegen von Schichtholz

Title (fr)

Procédé pour courber de bois lamellée

Publication

EP 1053840 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830347 A

Priority

IT TS990008 A

Abstract (en)

The process comprises the following steps: inserting some strips of wood (1), previously covered with glue, in a straight metal profile (2) having a U-shaped cross-section; interposing some strips of plastic (3) between the side walls (2.1) of the metal profile (2) and the strips of wood (1); feeding the metal profile (2), which contains the strips of wood and plastic (1, 3), to a roller bending machine, which cambers the whole pack; allowing the metal profile (2) to rest until the glue applied between the strips of wood (1) dries; removing the cambered pack of strips of wood (1) and plastic (3) from the metal profile (2) and removing, if necessary, the side strips of plastic (3); transferring the cambered lamellar wooden element (4) so obtained to the next ordinary finishing steps. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27H 1/00; B27M 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27H 1/00 (2006.01); B27M 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27M 3/0053 (2013.01); B27H 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053840 A2 20001122; EP 1053840 A3 20040602; IT 1313454 B1 20020724; IT TS990008 A1 20001113; IT TS990008 D0 19990513

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041203

2005-03-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2005-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI