Global Patent Index - EP 1053842 A2

EP 1053842 A2 2000-11-22 - Shuttering tray

Title (en)

Shuttering tray

Title (de)

Unterlagebrett

Title (fr)

Palette de moulage

Publication

EP 1053842 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500096 A

Priority

ES 9901287 U

Abstract (en)

Of the type whose structure is based on a panel (1) composed of a series of dovetailed tongue-and-grooved planks, whose edges intended to move on the press guides are reinforced by means of metal, channelled sections (4), focuses its characteristics on the said sections being overdimensioned in length, in such a way that at each of their ends their middle branch (9) is bent orthogonally towards the concave area of the section, by means of a bend (5), at the same time that their lateral branches do so simultaneously and on the previous bend, forming in their turn coplanar bends (6-6') that make contact with one another via their free edge (7) and which form for each end of the metal section perfectly flat faces, rounded vertices and edges (8) and a multilayer structure that considerably increases their mechanical strength. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/0055 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053842 A2 20001122; EP 1053842 A3 20021127; EP 1053842 B1 20050504; DE 60019846 D1 20050609; DE 60019846 T2 20060202; ES 1043213 U 19991116; ES 1043213 Y 20000501; PT 1053842 E 20050729

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60019846

- Effective date: 20141202

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60019846

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130524

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60019846

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE CHARRIER RAPP & LIEBAU, DE

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121119

2012-11-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20121119

2011-07-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110607

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60019846 P 20050609

2005-06-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR PT

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR PT

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI