Global patent index - EP 1053844 A2

EP 1053844 A2 2000-11-22 - Process for obtaining fresh concrete and heating device , supplying device , mixing plant for fresh concrete

Title (en)

Process for obtaining fresh concrete and heating device , supplying device , mixing plant for fresh concrete

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Frischbeton, Erwärmungsvorrichtung, Bevorratungsvorrichtung, Frischbetonmischanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de béton frais ainsi que dispositif de chauffage , dispositif d'approvisionnement et installation de mélange pour béton frais

Publication

EP 1053844 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110207 A

Priority

DE 29908974 U

Abstract (en)

The warming device for the materials (16) for mixing has a line by means of which a heated medium cab be passed through the materials for mixing. This line may be subjected to infrared radiation and may be used as a dark radiator. It may be curved or angled. It may have a region which is angled at not more than 30 degrees from the vertical.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Herstellung von Frischbeton, mit dem ein erwärmter Frischbeton hergestellt wird, erfolgt die Erwärmung, indem ein erwärmtes Medium durch das zu erwärmende Material geführt wird. Eine Vorrichtung (10) zum Erwärmen eines Mischgutes (16) hat eine Leitung (30), mit der ein erwärmtes Medium durch das Mischgut geführt werden kann. Eine Vorrichtung (13) zur Bevorratung von Mischgut (16) hat einen Lagerbereich (13a - f) zum Lagern des Mischgutes, einen Entnahmebereich (12) zum Entnehmen des Mischgutes aus dem Lagerbereich, und eine Erwärmungsvorrichtung (10) zum Erwärmen des Mischgutes wie oben beschrieben. Eine Betonmischanlage hat Bevorratungsvorrichtungen (13a - f) für Mischgüter (16a - f) und eine Mischanlage (11), die Mischgüter aus Bevorratungsvorrichtungen mischt, wobei zumindest eine Bevorratungsvorrichtung wie oben beschrieben aufgebaut ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 7/00; B28C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28C 7/00 (2006.01); B28C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28C 7/003 (2013.01); B28C 9/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908974 U1 19991216; EP 1053844 A2 20001122; EP 1053844 A3 20021106

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI