Global Patent Index - EP 1053853 A1

EP 1053853 A1 2000-11-22 - Apparatus for taking out molded products

Title (en)

Apparatus for taking out molded products

Title (de)

Entnahmevorrichtung für geformte Erzeugnisse

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour enlever des produits moulés

Publication

EP 1053853 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00109627 A

Priority

JP 12679799 A

Abstract (en)

In an apparatus for taking out a molded product (20) by adsorbing after die opening, a CPU (1) calculates a target arrival time at which a retaining mechanism section (7) will arrive at a take-out position, and at the moment (ST) at which the target arrival time becomes coincident with the ejection time Te' required for the separation of the molded product (20), an ejection signal is released for starting the operation of the ejecting mechanism section (8). With this arrangement, the time for taking out the molded product is reduced while imperfect adsorption by the retaining mechanism section (7) is avoided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 45/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/40 (2006.01); B29C 33/44 (2006.01); B29C 45/42 (2006.01); B29C 45/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/7626 (2013.01); B29C 45/42 (2013.01); B29C 2045/4275 (2013.01); B29C 2045/7633 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053853 A1 20001122; JP 2000317998 A 20001121; JP 3010490 B1 20000221; TW 479617 U 20020311

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011113

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI