Global patent index - EP 1053862 A1

EP 1053862 A1 2000-11-22 - A machine for forming bundles of compacted objects inside a sack

Title (en)

A machine for forming bundles of compacted objects inside a sack

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Bündeln von gepressten Gegenständen innerhalb eines Beutels

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la formation de paquets d'objets compactés à l'intérieur d'un sac

Publication

EP 1053862 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00830315 A

Priority

IT MO990104 A

Abstract (en)

A conveyor screw (7) conveys objects (2) to be compacted towards an outlet (5) of a tubular conduit (3), about which a sack (6) is fitted. The sack (6) is progressively unfolded from the conduit (3) by effect of the thrust of the objects (2) as they leave the outlet (5). A deformable truncoconical wall (8) is predisposed upstream of the outlet (5) to contrast an advancement of the objects (2), which are then forced against the wall (8) and forced to pass through a passage afforded at a centre of the wall (8). Before entering the sack (6) the objects (2) are crushed between the conveyor screw (7) and the wall (8). The machine is used for collecting and disposal of single-use bags made of a flexible material such as paper, sackcloth, jute or plastic, used for packing powder or granular materials. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 9/30; B65B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/30 (2006.01); B65B 9/15 (2006.01); C02F 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 11/121 (2013.01); B30B 9/3082 (2013.01); B30B 9/3096 (2013.01); B65B 9/15 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053862 A1 20001122; IT 1311189 B1 20020304; IT MO990104 A1 20001114; IT MO990104 D0 19990514

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020809

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010413

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI