Global Patent Index - EP 1053863 A2

EP 1053863 A2 2000-11-22 - Apparatus for manufacturing moulded articles

Title (en)

Apparatus for manufacturing moulded articles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Presslingen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication des pièces moulées

Publication

EP 1053863 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109494 A

Priority

DE 29908594 U

Abstract (en)

An arrangement for producing pressed components, esp. a tablet machine, comprises a rotating die table and an associated fil shoe for filling a material to be pressed into the die. The shoe height can be adjusted with respect to the die table using a positioning motor.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Preßlingen, vorzugsweise Tablettenmaschine, mit einem rotierenden Matrizentisch (14) und einem diesem zugeordneten stationären Füllschuh (16) zum Einfüllen des in der Matrize zu pressenden Einsatzmaterials, wobei der Füllschuh (16) über einen Stellmotor (15) gegenüber der Oberfläche des rotierenden Matrizentisches (14) höheneinstellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/08 (2006.01); B30B 15/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/304 (2013.01); B30B 11/08 (2013.01); B30B 15/302 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908594 U1 19991104; DE 50012273 D1 20060427; EP 1053863 A2 20001122; EP 1053863 A3 20020710; EP 1053863 B1 20060301; US 6612827 B1 20030902

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150504

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150504

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150504

2015-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012273

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140708

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140516

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FETTE COMPACTING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FETTE GMBH, 21493 SCHWARZENBEK, DE

- Document: DE 50012273

- Effective date: 20110621

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012273 P 20060427

2006-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2006-03-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041118

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FETTE GMBH

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 30B 11/08 A, 7B 30B 15/30 B

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI