Global patent index - EP 1053869 A2

EP 1053869 A2 2000-11-22 - Method of and apparatus for making heat-sensitive stencil master

Title (en)

Method of and apparatus for making heat-sensitive stencil master

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung wärmeempfindlicher Druckschablonen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de fabrication de matrice de stencil thermosensible

Publication

EP 1053869 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00110725 A

Priority

JP 14130099 A

Abstract (en)

A heat-sensitive stencil master is made by imagewise perforating a heat-sensitive stencil master material by use of a thermal head having a plurality of heater elements which are arranged in a main scanning direction and are respectively energized through discrete electrodes while the stencil master material is fed in a sub-scanning direction. A thermal head in which each of the heater elements is divided into at least two segments which are connected to a common discrete electrode to be energized simultaneously with each other is used and each picture element of the stencil master is formed by two or more small perforations formed by the segments of each heater element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/345 (2006.01); B41C 1/055 (2006.01); B41C 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/144 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053869 A2 20001122; EP 1053869 A3 20030205; EP 1053869 B1 20040804; DE 60012615 D1 20040909; JP 2000326474 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060519

2006-05-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060519

2005-07-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-05-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60012615

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-08-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2003-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 41C 1/14 A

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 41J 2/345 B

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI