Global patent index - EP 1053887 A2

EP 1053887 A2 2000-11-22 - Orloff multicolour printing process

Title (en)

Orloff multicolour printing process

Title (de)

Orloff-Mehrfarbendruckverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé d'impression Orloff en plusieurs couleurs

Publication

EP 1053887 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810426 A

Priority

RU 99109705 A

Abstract (en)

Method involves rolling assembled plate cylinder printing form with ink by means of gage rolls connected with plate cylinder through toothed gear; imparting forced cyclic reciprocating motion to gage rolls in axial direction and circumferentially relati to plate cylinder without disintegrating toothed gear from plate cylinder, with gage roll reciprocating motion speed being withi the range of 0.2-4.0 mm and ratio of reciprocating motion number and gage roll revolution number being irrational value of 2-10. Auxiliary accumulating gage roll may be used for receiving and transmitting of color pattern, when this gage is in contact with rubber webs of blanket cylinder. Boundary zone of color gage may be increased by using continuous or stepped screen scale with decreasing filling area.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf die Polygrafie und kann beim Druck von Wertpapieren, insbesondere von Banknoten, sowie bei der Herstellung von anderen mehrfarbigen Druckerzeugnissen angewendet werden. Den Schablonenwalzen wird beim Einfärben der Sammeldruckform eines Formzylinders eine zyklische hin- und hergehende Zwangsbewegung (M) in der Axial- und der Umfangsrichtung relativ zum Formzylinder erteilt, ohne den Zahnradantrieb derselben von dem letzteren zu stören, wodurch der Druck mit einem Iriseffekt innerhalb der vollen Erfassung in der Umfangsrichtung erfolgt. Die Größe der hin- und hergehenden Bewegung der Schablonenwalzen liegt in einem Bereich von Werten zwischen 0,2 und 4,0 mm , während die Verhältnisse zwischen der Anzahl der rückläufigen Bewegungen und der Drehzahl der Schablonenzylinder irrationale Zahlen sind, die im Bereich von 2 bis 10 liegen. Die Zwangsbewegung der Schablonenwalzen führt dazu, daß auf der kontinuierlich gefärbten Linie Farbmischungszonen (4a), (4b) und (4c) gebildet werden und eine Zone (4b) der Komplementärfarbe erscheint. Die Iriszonen des Farbenübergangs des Musters vergrößern seinen gesamten Farbenreichtum dank der Erzielung einer Komplementärfarbe und von Farbtönungen, was die Schutzeigenschaften des Musters erhöht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B41F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053887 A2 20001122; EP 1053887 A3 20010425; EP 1053887 B1 20040421; AT 264756 T 20040515; DE 50006115 D1 20040527; RU 2143344 C1 19991227

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2009-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FEDERAL STATE UNITARY ENTERPRISE GOZNAK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006115

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41M 1/14 A, 7B 41F 11/00 B

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI