Global Patent Index - EP 1053887 A3

EP 1053887 A3 2001-04-25 - Orloff multicolour printing process

Title (en)

Orloff multicolour printing process

Title (de)

Orloff-Mehrfarbendruckverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé d'impression Orloff en plusieurs couleurs

Publication

EP 1053887 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00810426 A

Priority

RU 99109705 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1053887A2] Method involves rolling assembled plate cylinder printing form with ink by means of gage rolls connected with plate cylinder through toothed gear; imparting forced cyclic reciprocating motion to gage rolls in axial direction and circumferentially relati to plate cylinder without disintegrating toothed gear from plate cylinder, with gage roll reciprocating motion speed being withi the range of 0.2-4.0 mm and ratio of reciprocating motion number and gage roll revolution number being irrational value of 2-10. Auxiliary accumulating gage roll may be used for receiving and transmitting of color pattern, when this gage is in contact with rubber webs of blanket cylinder. Boundary zone of color gage may be increased by using continuous or stepped screen scale with decreasing filling area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 1/14; B41F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B41F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053887 A2 20001122; EP 1053887 A3 20010425; EP 1053887 B1 20040421; AT 264756 T 20040515; DE 50006115 D1 20040527; RU 2143344 C1 19991227

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JOINT STOCK COMPANY "GOZNAK", RU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FEDERAL STATE UNITARY ENTERPRISE GOZNAK, ST.PETERSBURG, RU

- Document: DE 50006115

2017-07-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006115

- Representative's name: PUSCHMANN BORCHERT BARDEHLE PATENTANWAELTE PAR, DE

2009-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2009-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FEDERAL STATE UNITARY ENTERPRISE GOZNAK

- Free text: ASSOCIATION OF GOZNAK#UL. MITNAYA, D. 17.#113162 MOSCOW (RU) $ SCIENTIFIC-RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF GOZNAK#UL. MITNAYA, D. 19.#113162 MOSCOW (RU) -TRANSFER TO- FEDERAL STATE UNITARY ENTERPRISE GOZNAK#3 PETROPAVLOVSKAYA KREPOST LETTER B#SAINT-PETERSBURG 197046 (RU)

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006115 P 20040527

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41M 1/14 A, 7B 41F 11/00 B

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI