Global patent index - EP 1053890 A1

EP 1053890 A1 2000-11-22 - Device for cutting brochures

Title (en)

Device for cutting brochures

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für den Beschnitt von Broschüren

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour couper des brochures

Publication

EP 1053890 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99109922 A

Priority

EP 99109922 A

Abstract (en)

The device for drawing back the flap edges from the cutting plane comprises at least one suction component(15,16) in the are the brochure(2) to be cut. The suction component is provided with at least one holding down device(11). Several suction componen are provided, arranged preferably linearly along a straight line, parallel to the block back(12).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung für den Beschnitt von Broschüren 2 entlang einer Schnittebene 8 an der Vorderseite der Broschüre, die aus einem bereits in einem Umschlag 5 eingehängten Block 3 besteht. Um den Frontschnitt nach dem Einhängen des Blockes in einen Umschlag mit vorstehenden oder bündig eingeschlagenen Klappen durchzuführen, ist vorgesehen, daß die Vorrichtung zum Beulen und Zurückziehen der Klappenkante 6, 7 aus der Schnittebene mindestens ein Saugelement 15, 16 im Bereich einer zu beschneidenden Broschüre 2 aufweist. Außerdem betrifft die Erfindung ein Verfahren zum Beschnitt von Broschüren aus einem in einem Umschlag eingehängten Buchblock, bei dem vor dem Beschnitt die Klappe durch Erzeugen einer Beule aus der Schnittebene zurückgezogen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42C 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/02 (2006.01); B42C 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42C 5/00 (2013.01); B42C 11/02 (2013.01); Y10T 83/04 (2015.04); Y10T 83/207 (2015.04); Y10T 83/929 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0754566 A1 19970122 - GRAPHA HOLDING AG [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053890 A1 20001122; EP 1053890 B1 20031203; DE 59907939 D1 20040115; JP 2001001296 A 20010109; US 2004187660 A1 20040930; US 2007006698 A1 20070111

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160517

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907939

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-08-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI