Global Patent Index - EP 1053939 A1

EP 1053939 A1 2000-11-22 - Apparatus for providing netting packages of horticultural products in continuously unwound tubular netting

Title (en)

Apparatus for providing netting packages of horticultural products in continuously unwound tubular netting

Title (de)

Vorrichting zum Herstellen von Netzverpackungen für gärtnerische Produkte in einem kontinuierlich abgewickelten Netzschlauch

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication de filets d'emballage pour produits de horticulture dans un fliet tubulaire déroulé en continu

Publication

EP 1053939 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00110172 A

Priority

IT BO990260 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for producing packages of horticultural products with tubular netting (42) which is unwound continuously from a reel, said apparatus comprising a frame (1), a tube (40) which is vertically suspended from said frame and inside said netting (42), said tube (40) having a lateral opening (47, 72) for loading the products which is aligned with the outlet of a product feeder (37), a cutting device (50) which is suitable to produce a slit (54a) in said netting in order to allow to load products inside said tube (40) through said slit (54a) and said opening (47, 72), characterized in that it comprises means (24-27, 30, 31, 48, 49) for controlling the sliding of said netting (42) on said tube (40) by an extent which defines a bag (S) for containing the products and means (14, 15) for closing said tubular netting (42) below said tube (40) according to two stacked closures (62, 63, 64), an upper closure (62) forming the bottom of said bag (S) and a lower closure (63, 64) closing the previously formed bag, means (14a, 15a) being further provided for cutting said netting (42) between said upper and lower closures (62 and 63, 64). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/13; B65B 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/13 (2006.01); B65B 9/14 (2006.01); B65B 51/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/14 (2013.01); B65B 9/13 (2013.01); B65B 51/303 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053939 A1 20001122; IT 1309251 B1 20020116; IT BO990260 A1 20001117; IT BO990260 D0 19990517

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031128

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021008

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010517

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI