Global Patent Index - EP 1053941 B1

EP 1053941 B1 2002-11-27 - APPARATUS FOR STRAPPING A PALETTISED LOAD

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR STRAPPING A PALETTISED LOAD

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMREIFUNG EINER PALETTISIERTEN LADUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ENCERCLER UNE CHARGE PALETTISEE

Publication

EP 1053941 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114566 A

Priority

  • DE 29908906 U
  • US 54481200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6516592B1] An apparatus, in particular an apparatus which can be manually operated and transported, being provided for the purpose of strapping and/or bundling pallets and articles with at least one base plate, with a band-leading device and with at least one clamping device arranged at the front end of the band-leading device. A guiding device, in which the band-leading device is guided, is provided on the base plate. A carriage, which has a deflecting unit, is releasably attached to the front end of the band-leading device. On the carriage there is fastened a length-limiting band, which can be fixed in a number of regions of the base plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6516592 B1 20030211; EP 1053941 A1 20001122; EP 1053941 B1 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100724

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100724

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090730

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030329

2003-02-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903537 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ERGOPACK DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010511

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI