Global Patent Index - EP 1053942 A1

EP 1053942 A1 2000-11-22 - Method and apparatus for inspecting cigarette ends

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for inspecting cigarette ends

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Prüfen von Zigarettenköpfen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour contrôler des bouts de cigarettes

Publication

EP 1053942 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109674 A

Priority

DE 19921721 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves monitoring the position of an image of a radiated section of the tip and comparing it with that of a ide tip. The tip (16) is radiated with a light beam (12) and the reflected light (20) focussed on a position sensitive detector (19) the radiated area is not in the ideal or reference position the deviation between that and the reference position indicates the quality of the cigarette

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Prüfen von Zigarettenköpfen (16), wobei wenigstens ein Bereich (37,38) eines Zigarettenkopfes mit Licht (18) bestrahlt und vom Zigarettenkopf (16) reflektiertes Licht (20) derart von einem Detektor (19) empfangen wird, daß bestrahlendes und empfangenes reflektiertes Licht (18,20) winkelig zueinander verlaufen und der bestrahlte Bereich (37,38) auf den Detektor (19) abgebildet und ein vom Detektor erzeugtes Signal ausgewertet wird. Derartige bekannte Verfahren haben den Nachteil, daß sie ungenau und keine exakten Aussagen über den Zustand von Zigaretten erlauben. Der Erfindung liegt daher das Problem zugrunde, das Prüfen von Zigaretten zu verbessern. Sie löst diese Problem dadurch, daß beim Auswerten eine etwaige Abweichung, insbesondere ein Abstand, der Position der Abbildung (43,44,45) des bestrahlten Bereichs (37,38) von einer erwarteten Position einer Abbildung eines entsprechenden Bereichs eines idealen Zigarettenkopfes (16) auf dem Detektor (19) ermittelt wird, wobei aus der Abweichung der Abstand des bestrahlten Bereichs zu einer Sollposition dieses Bereichs bestimmt wird. Die Erfindung betrifft auch eine Vorrichtung zum Durchführen dieses Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/34 (2006.01); B65B 19/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/3412 (2013.01); B65B 19/30 (2013.01); Y10S 131/908 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19921721 A1 20001116; EP 1053942 A1 20001122; EP 1053942 B1 20040728; US 6407807 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007175

- Effective date: 20121201

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100506

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100506

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100506

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090506

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090516

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-10-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007175 P 20040902

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010517

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI