Global Patent Index - EP 1053943 A1

EP 1053943 A1 2000-11-22 - Method and apparatus for packaging products, particularly food or pharmaceutical products

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for packaging products, particularly food or pharmaceutical products

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum verpacken von insbesondere Lebensmitteln oder Pharmazeutika

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour emballer des produits, en particulier des denrées alimentaires ou médicaments

Publication

EP 1053943 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109822 A

Priority

DE 19921562 A

Abstract (en)

Packaging products, in particular, food and pharmaceutical items, comprising introducing argon as an inert gas into the packaging container before its closure, is new. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for implementation of the novel method. The apparatus is characteriz by an inert gas introduction unit which is joined to an argon source.

Abstract (de)

Es werden ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Produkten, insbesondere Lebensmitteln und Pharmazeutika, vorgeschlagen. Um auch bei kohlendioxidfreien oder kohlendioxidarmen Produkten zu gewährleisten, daß unerwünschter Sauerstoff aus der Verpackung verdrängt wird und die Verpackung zur besseren Etikettierbarkeit und Stapelbarkeit einen gewünschten Innendruck aufweist, wird vorgeschlagen, gasförmiges Argon in das Produkt einzutragen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/00; B65B 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/00 (2006.01); B65B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 31/00 (2013.01); B65B 25/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19921562 A1 20001116; AT 273169 T 20040815; EP 1053943 A1 20001122; EP 1053943 B1 20040811; ES 2231071 T3 20050516

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080501

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20080115

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-06-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080115

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070510

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-29 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: LINDE AG#ABRAHAM-LINCOLN-STRASSE 21#65189 WIESBADEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#LEOPOLDSTRASSE 252#80807 MUENCHEN (DE)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050111

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDE A.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2007-05-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDE A.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A.

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A.

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A.

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2231071 T3

2005-05-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A.

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-05-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-05-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-11-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-11-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-11-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007341 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI