Global Patent Index - EP 1053944 A1

EP 1053944 A1 2000-11-22 - PACKAGING METHOD AS WELL AS PACKAGE FOR PRESERVATION AND/OR COOKING OR REHEATING OF FOOD PRODUCTS

Title (en)

PACKAGING METHOD AS WELL AS PACKAGE FOR PRESERVATION AND/OR COOKING OR REHEATING OF FOOD PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE VERPACKUNG ZUM KONSERVIEREN UND/ODER KOCHEN ODER AUFWÄRMEN VON NAHRUNGSMITTELN

Title (fr)

Procédé de conditionnement et conditionnement pour la conservation et/ou la cuisson ou le réchauffage de produits alimentaires

Publication

EP 1053944 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440143 A

Priority

FR 9906680 A

Abstract (en)

The container, which is hermetically sealed by a plastic film cover after filling with the foodstuff, has a base and a false bottom with perforations. A water-soaked pad or humidifier, made from a spongy material containing a chemical or natural flavori agent, is located in the space between the base and false bottom. The film cover has a hole in it covered by a detachable sealing disc or label which can be removed before the container is placed in a microwave oven, the container and cover being made from microwavable materials.

Abstract (fr)

Conditionnement pour la conservation et/ou la cuisson ou le réchauffage de produits alimentaires frais, tels que, par exemple, légumes ou fruits crus ou précuits ou plats cuisinés, comprenant un emballage hermétiquement clos dans lequel sont placés lesdits produits alimentaires (8), cet emballage comprenant, d'une part, un récipient ou barquette (1) comportant un fond (2) et un faux fond (3) muni de perforations (4), disposé au-dessus et à distance dudit fond (2) et, d'autre part, un film de matière plastique (9) recouvrant le récipient et son contenu et soudé sur ledit récipient, caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend encore un tampon saturateur ou humidificateur (7) imbibé d'eau, placé dans l'espace (E) ménagé entre le fond (2) et le faux fond (3) dudit récipient (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/22; B65D 81/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 3/00 (2006.01); A23L 5/10 (2016.01); B65B 25/22 (2006.01); B65D 65/02 (2006.01); B65D 65/40 (2006.01); B65D 81/24 (2006.01); B65D 81/34 (2006.01); B65D 85/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/22 (2013.01); B65D 81/3453 (2013.01); B65D 2205/00 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3433 (2013.01); B65D 2581/345 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053944 A1 20001122; EP 1053944 B1 20020403; AT 215468 T 20020415; AU 4765100 A 20001212; AU 773831 B2 20040610; BR 0011598 A 20020402; CA 2373349 A1 20001130; CN 1134368 C 20040114; CN 1351562 A 20020529; CZ 20012893 A3 20020116; DE 60000105 D1 20020508; DE 60000105 T2 20021128; DK 1053944 T3 20020729; EE 200100614 A 20030217; ES 2174808 T3 20021116; FR 2793771 A1 20001124; FR 2793771 B1 20010720; HU 0105117 A2 20020529; HU 0105117 A3 20020628; IL 146590 D0 20020725; JP 2003500297 A 20030107; MX PA01011879 A 20020604; NO 20014069 A 20011115; NO 20014069 D0 20010821; NZ 514665 A 20020927; PL 350816 A1 20030210; PT 1053944 E 20020930; WO 0071421 A1 20001130; ZA 200106925 B 20020731

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130519

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130519

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070519

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GROUPE GUILLIN

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *SEALED AIR

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-12-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-12-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-05-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-05-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-12-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1053944E

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174808 T3

2002-10-09 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020402350

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVETS ET MARQUES GANGUILLET & HUMP

2002-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-08-09 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020809

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-07-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-07-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-06-05 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020605

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-05-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020529

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-05-24 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20020524

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-05-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-05-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020514

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-05-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020514

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-05-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020513

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-05-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020508

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000105 20020508

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20010403;LV PAYMENT 20010403

2002-04-03 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2002-04-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215468 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20010403;LV PAYMENT 20010403

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010403

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI