Global Patent Index - EP 1053946 A1

EP 1053946 A1 2000-11-22 - Device for opening bags or packages

Title (en)

Device for opening bags or packages

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum öffnen von Beuteln oder Paketen

Title (fr)

Dispositif ouvre sacs et ouvre paquets

Publication

EP 1053946 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401319 A

Priority

FR 9906858 A

Abstract (en)

Mechanism comprises frame where three parallel and non-coplanar shafts (10, 20, 30) are placed. Each shaft has series of cog rings (11.j. 21.j', 31.j'). Teeth (110.j) of central shaft (10) has edge (111.j, 112.j) with teeth useful in both direction of rotation of shaft. Teeth (211.j', 311.j') of adjacent shafts have teeth useful in only one direction of rotation so that, in first direction o rotation, cogged edge (311.j') of first shaft (30) works together with first cogged edge (111.j) of central shaft, and, in secon direction of rotation, cogged edge (211.j') of second shaft (20) works together with second cogged edge (112.j) of central shaft

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif ouvre sacs et ouvre paquets caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend un châssis dans lequel sont montés trois arbres (10, 20, 30), parallèles et non coplanaires, chaque arbre (10, 20, 30) est animé d'un mouvement de rotation et comporte une pluralité de couronnes (11.j, 21.j', 31.j') dentées, les dents (110.j) de l'arbre central ayant une tranche (111.j, 112.j) à denture efficace dans les deux sens de rotation de l'arbre, les dents (211.j', 311.j') des arbres (20, 30) adjacents ayant une tranche efficace dans un seul sens de rotation de sorte que dans un sens de rotation la tranche efficace (311.j') des dents du premier arbre (30) collabore avec une tranche (111.j) des dents de l'arbre central (10) et dans le sens opposé de rotation la tranche efficace (311.j') des dents du deuxième arbre (20) collabore avec l'autre tranche (112.j) des dents de l'arbre central (10), l'orientation de la denture efficace des dents étant sensiblement perpendiculaire à une direction radiale. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 69/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 69/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 69/0008 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5484247 A 19960116 - CLARK BRIAN K [US], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053946 A1 20001122; FR 2793772 A1 20001124; FR 2793772 B1 20010810

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081201

2008-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-09-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI