Global patent index - EP 1053948 A3

EP 1053948 A3 2001-04-04 - Package with a zipper closure arrangement operable by a slider device and having a peelable seal

Title (en)

Package with a zipper closure arrangement operable by a slider device and having a peelable seal

Title (de)

Sack mit Reissverschluss und abziehbarer Innendichtung

Title (fr)

Sac avec fermeture à glissière et joint hermétique interne

Publication

EP 1053948 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00460034 A

Priority

  • US 13427899 P
  • US 56761600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1053948A2] A flexible package (10) includes a recloseable zipper closure (11) along the mouth of the package for selective opening and closing of the mouth. The zipper closure includes first and second closure profiles (12,14), which are configured and constructed to selectively interlock. A slider device (16) is configured and constructed to facilitate the mating (closing) and unmating (opening) of the zipper closure. A tamper evident peelable seal (50) is provided between the zipper closure and the interior (25) of the bag to indicate whether or not an attempt has been made to access the interior of the package. The peelable seal can extend between the package walls, one package wall and one closure profile, or between first and second closure profiles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/25

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/2591 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053948 A2 20001122; EP 1053948 A3 20010404

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011207

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010127

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI